+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On August 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 286, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 5950.).
On August 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 4371.).
On August 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11).
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4587.)
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 9).
On March 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 11, 2014: AB 1912 HOLDEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
August 7, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1912 Holden By Mitchell
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 9
June 11, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
April 24, 2014: AB 1912 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 6
April 9, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
March 26, 2014: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor