+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On August 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 183, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6200.).
On June 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4878.).
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 12).
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on V.A.
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on V.A.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4432.)
On March 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 20).
On February 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on V.A.
On January 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 22.
On January 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 9, 2018: AB 1908 CHÁVEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
June 25, 2018: Consent Calendar AB1908
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 3
June 12, 2018: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
April 2, 2018: AB 1908 CHÁVEZ Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 5
March 20, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor