+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On June 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15).
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4970.)
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 19).
On April 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On March 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On February 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
On February 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (5)
June 27, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 15, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
May 25, 2022: AB 1900 Arambula Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 4
May 19, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
March 22, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 2