+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 382, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5284.).
On August 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13).
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 5254.)
On May 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9).
On May 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On May 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On February 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and L. GOV.
On January 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 22.
On January 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
August 13, 2018: Special Consent AB1900
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 13, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 21, 2018: AB 1900 BROUGH Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
May 9, 2018: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor