+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On April 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On January 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 27.
On January 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
April 13, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 7
April 13, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 7
April 13, 2015: Reconsideration.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor