+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 566, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6629.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6616.)
On August 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4896.).
On August 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On August 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 2. Page 5000.)
On May 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On May 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 29).
On March 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 28, 2014: AB 1898 BROWN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
August 27, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1898 Brown By Hernandez
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
June 24, 2014: Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
June 18, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 19, 2014: AB 1898 BROWN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 9
April 29, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 10
March 25, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor