+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On April 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On February 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
On February 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 12, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor