+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 450, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
On August 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5870.).
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4878.).
On August 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15).
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4459.)
On April 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On April 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 4).
On February 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
On February 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
August 18, 2016: AB 1891 DABABNEH Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 11, 2016: Special Consent AB1891 Dababneh By Nguyen
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
April 21, 2016: AB 1891 DABABNEH Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
April 4, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor