+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On September 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 251, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6351.).
On August 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5285.).
On August 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On July 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 4894.)
On April 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 18).
On April 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
On February 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On January 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 18.
On January 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 20, 2018: AB 1889 CABALLERO Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 13, 2018: Special Consent AB1889
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 27, 2018: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
April 26, 2018: AB 1889 CABALLERO Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
April 18, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor