+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
On May 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
On April 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On April 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On February 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor