+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 15, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 14. Page 4874.)
On March 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 9, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 4273.)
On February 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On February 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
On January 17, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 7.
On January 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
June 15, 2020: AB 1887 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor