+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 576, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 6492.).
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 5440.).
On August 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 20).
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on EQ.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 5463.)
On May 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 23).
On May 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 23).
On April 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On April 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On February 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On January 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 17.
On January 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 23, 2018: AB 1884 CALDERON Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 5
August 20, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1884 Calderon et al. By Stern
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
June 20, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2018: AB 1884 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 4
May 23, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3