+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 24).
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5362.)
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23).
On May 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
On February 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 4, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
June 24, 2014: Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 29, 2014: AB 1882 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
May 23, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 8, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor