+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On October 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 629, Statutes of 2017.
On September 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3332.).
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2753.).
On September 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- Ordered to third reading.
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Held at Desk.
On September 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to the Senate.
- Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2349.).
On August 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 21).
On July 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On July 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and EQ.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1924.)
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 26).
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On January 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On January 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 19.
On January 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 13, 2017: AB 188 Salas Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
September 12, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB188 Salas et al. By Lara
- Yeas: 40
August 31, 2017: Special Consent Calendar # AB188
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
August 21, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
July 5, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
June 27, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
May 31, 2017: AB 188 SALAS Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 26, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
March 27, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14