+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On March 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On January 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On January 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 17.
On January 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.