+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 480, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 5649.).
On August 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 5520.)
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
On May 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 11).
On March 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On January 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On January 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 16.
On January 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 23, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1871 Bonta et al. By Leyva
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 3
August 16, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 25, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 13, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 30, 2018: AB 1871 BONTA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 6
May 25, 2018: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 11, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1