+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (May 13).
On May 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 696.)
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On March 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and REV. & TAX.
On January 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
On January 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
May 13, 2013: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor