+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On May 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
On May 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On February 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On February 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
On February 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 11, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 14
April 13, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor