+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 428, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6807.).
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5648.).
On August 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13).
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5245.)
On May 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 9).
On January 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On January 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 12.
On January 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
August 29, 2018: AB 1868 CUNNINGHAM Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 23, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1868 Cunningham By Galgiani
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 21, 2018: AB 1868 CUNNINGHAM Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 4
May 9, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor