+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 804, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 6361.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6347.)
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 4716.).
On August 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 24).
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 2. Page 5091.)
On May 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 30).
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 7).
On February 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 22, 2014: AB 1867 PATTERSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 9
August 21, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1867 Patterson By Vidak
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 6
June 24, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
May 23, 2014: AB 1867 PATTERSON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 10
April 30, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 7, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor