+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 434, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6122.).
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 6114.)
On August 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4984.).
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- 6-16-2022 hearing rescheduled by committee to 6-15-2022
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4966.)
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19).
On May 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On April 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6).
On March 7, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
On February 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (8)
August 24, 2022: AB 1867 Lee Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
August 23, 2022: Special Consent AB1867
- Yeas: 40
August 11, 2022: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
August 1, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 15, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2022: AB 1867 Lee Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 2
May 19, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
April 6, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor