+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On August 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 126, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On August 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4728.).
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14).
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4260.)
On April 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On March 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 29).
On March 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On February 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
On February 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
August 1, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1867 Steinorth By Moorlach
- Yeas: 39
June 14, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
April 11, 2016: AB 1867 STEINORTH Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
March 29, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor