+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On June 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4589.)
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On April 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 1).
On February 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 25, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 4
June 25, 2014: Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted.
- Yeas: 7
April 24, 2014: AB 1862 MELENDEZ Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 5
April 1, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor