+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4771.)
On May 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4721.)
On May 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On April 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27).
On April 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
On February 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 21, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 12, 2016: AB 1848 CHIU Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
April 27, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 19
- Present/NV: 1
April 5, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor