+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 597, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6085.).
On August 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4411.).
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E.Q.
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4759.)
On May 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 30).
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 7).
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On February 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 18, 2014: AB 1846 GORDON Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
August 11, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1846 Gordon By Jackson
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
June 4, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 5, 2014: AB 1846 GORDON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 5
April 30, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 7, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor