+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On October 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 765, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3090.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.)
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.)
On September 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2235.).
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1734.)
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24).
On April 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
On January 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 10, 2013: AB 184 GATTO Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
September 9, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB184 Gatto By Nielsen
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
August 12, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 25, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
May 29, 2013: AB 184 GATTO Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
May 24, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 17
March 12, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor