+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 819, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6483.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6474.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5484.).
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5081.)
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27).
On April 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
On February 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
On February 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 30, 2016: AB 1836 MAIENSCHEIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 29, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1836 Maienschein By Hertzberg
- Yeas: 39
August 8, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 28, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
June 1, 2016: AB 1836 MAIENSCHEIN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 80
May 27, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 20
March 29, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
March 15, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor