+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 117, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On July 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1874.).
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1830.).
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 15).
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
On May 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee May 9.
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced pursuant to Joint Rule 54.
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
July 1, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1830 Gonzalez By Portantino Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 24, 2019: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 22, 2019: AB 1830 Gonzalez Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 15, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor