+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on C. & C.
On January 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
On January 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 10, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor