+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On February 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 22, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1