+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On October 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On April 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
On March 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
On February 7, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analysis
+ − Vote
April 19, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor