+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 5262.)
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
- From inactive file.
On July 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (June 26).
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 4881.)
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 5105.)
On May 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 18. Page 5026.)
On January 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On January 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
On January 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
June 26, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
May 10, 2018: AB 1823 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Budget
Type:
Primary Sponsor