+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 117, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On June 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4650.).
On June 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4361.)
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 6).
On March 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
On February 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 30, 2016: Consent Calendar 2nd AB1813 Frazier
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 14, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
April 14, 2016: AB 1813 FRAZIER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 6, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 2
March 14, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor