+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 17).
On March 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
On January 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On January 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 18.
On January 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 17, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor