+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4999.)
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended.
On April 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On January 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
On January 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 3, 2018: AB 1802 SALAS Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 6
April 24, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor