+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
On May 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 29).
On April 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
On February 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On February 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 29, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
April 2, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife.
- Yeas: 9