+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On August 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 198, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4879.).
On August 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21).
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4040.)
On March 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On March 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 15).
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
On February 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
August 11, 2016: Special Consent AB1798 Cooper
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
June 21, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
March 28, 2016: AB 1798 COOPER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 5
March 15, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor