+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (32)
On September 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 582, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 20.).
On August 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 5180.).
On August 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH, ED. and JUD.
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 20.)
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19).
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On May 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 27).
On April 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- (pending re-refer to Com. on ED.)
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4359.)
On April 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED.
On February 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
On February 7, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (8)
+ − Votes (9)
August 30, 2022: AB 1797 Akilah Weber Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 3
August 29, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1797 Akilah Weber et al. By Newman
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
August 1, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 30, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 22, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 26, 2022: AB 1797 Akilah Weber Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 4
May 19, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 27, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 26, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2