+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (33)
On September 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 608, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6482.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6474.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5487.).
On August 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
On August 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 61(b)(16) suspended. (Page 5315.)
- In Senate. Held at Desk.
On August 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to the Senate.
On August 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5043.).
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 5220.)
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 4.) (May 27).
On April 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On March 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
On February 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2016: AB 1795 ATKINS Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 17, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1795 Atkins By Pan
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 4
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 15, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
June 2, 2016: AB 1795 ATKINS Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 27, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
March 15, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 2