+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 17).
On April 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On January 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On January 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
On January 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 17, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor