+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On September 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 725, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 19. Page 6517.).
On August 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 10. Page 4833.).
On August 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 18).
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 22. Page 5025.)
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 4960.)
On May 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 7).
On February 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On February 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 27, 2014: AB 1795 ALEJO Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 7
August 25, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1795 Alejo By Hueso
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 8
June 18, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 19, 2014: AB 1795 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 10
May 15, 2014: AB 1795 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading Amend By ALEJO Set #1
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 3
May 7, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor