+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate inactive file.
On August 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Skinner.
On August 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On August 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On August 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On August 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
On August 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (July 3).
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20).
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and T. & H.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 5372.)
On May 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 9).
On March 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On January 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
On January 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
July 3, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
June 20, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing]
- Yeas: 7
May 29, 2018: AB 1792 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 23
May 9, 2018: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor