+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 122, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On July 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5038.).
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4789.)
On April 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 11).
On April 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 20).
On January 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On January 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 8.
On January 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 2, 2018: Consent Calendar AB1791
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
June 11, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 19, 2018: AB 1791 WALDRON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 71
- Present/NV: 7
April 11, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
March 20, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 3