+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 447, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6041.).
On August 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4980.).
On August 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 1).
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On June 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4869.)
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 11).
On April 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On March 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On March 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
On February 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 22, 2016: AB 1789 SANTIAGO Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
August 15, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1789 Santiago By Liu
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
August 1, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
June 15, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 19, 2016: AB 1789 SANTIAGO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 11, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 20
April 11, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor