+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 507, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 9. Page 6422.).
On August 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) .
On August 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 4973.).
On August 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 29).
On June 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E.Q.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4263.)
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 6).
On March 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
On February 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 30, 2016: AB 1787 GOMEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
August 25, 2016: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 9
August 15, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1787 Gomez By Nguyen
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
June 29, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 8, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 3
April 11, 2016: AB 1787 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 6
April 6, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 3
March 14, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor