+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On August 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6187.).
On August 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5049.).
On August 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5178.)
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27).
On April 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6).
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
On February 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 24, 2016: AB 1783 DODD Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 17, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1783 Dodd By Wolk
- Yeas: 39
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 22, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
June 2, 2016: AB 1783 DODD Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 20
April 6, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor