+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (28)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On July 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 18. Page 2121.)
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Page 1982.)
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1983.)
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 8).
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 23).
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 9).
On April 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
On March 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 19, 2020: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
August 13, 2020: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 4
May 29, 2019: AB 1782 Chau Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 13
May 8, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
April 9, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor