+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
On August 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6360.).
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5285.).
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4361.)
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 6).
On March 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On March 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On February 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
On February 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 29, 2016: AB 1782 MAIENSCHEIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 23, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1782 Maienschein By Jackson
- Yeas: 39
August 11, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 28, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
June 15, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
April 14, 2016: AB 1782 MAIENSCHEIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 6, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 2
March 15, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor