+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On April 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
On March 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & C.
On February 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 7, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Utilities and Commerce.
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
April 7, 2014: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor