+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15).
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E.Q.
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4462.)
On April 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 13).
On March 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On March 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On February 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
On February 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 15, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
April 21, 2016: AB 1776 OBERNOLTE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
April 13, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 20
March 29, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor